Carlisle, Maxine Alexis (CPSO#: 81328)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Dec 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Dec 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mary Berglund CHC
1100 Main Street
PO Box 450
Ignace ON  P0T 1T0
Phone: (807) 934-2251
Electoral District: 09
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

La Verendrye Hospital
110 Victoria Avenue
Fort Frances ON  P9A 2B7
Canada
Phone: 807-274-3261
County: District of Rainy River
Electoral District: 09

Lake of the Woods District Hospital
21 Sylvan Street
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Canada
Phone: 807-468-9861
County: District of Kenora
Electoral District: 09

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
La Verendrye Hospital,Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAXINE ALEXIS CARLISLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARLISLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 19 Mar 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 20 Mar 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 26 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 27 Aug 2007 to 24 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2008