Carlos, Joseph Mercado (CPSO#: 27837)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Jun 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Filipino

Education:University of Santo Tomas, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joseph M. Carlos Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 20 2015

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1975
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Dec 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Jun 2015

Concerns

Source: Discipline Committee
Active Date: June 15, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Carlos was referred to the Discipline Committee by Notice of Hearing dated November 13, 2014, on allegations of professional misconduct and incompetence. Effective June 15, 2015, Dr. Carlos has resigned from the College and has undertaken not to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction. Dr. Carlos does not admit the allegations. Given Dr. Carlos' resignation and undertaking, the College has withdrawn the Notice of Hearing.