Carmichael, Frederick James (CPSO#: 30970)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Oct 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Oct 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health Centre
Department of Surgery
101 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 747-3500
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carmichael Hood Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 16 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Hood ( CPSO# 33172 )
Dr. F. Carmichael ( CPSO# 30970 )

Business Address:
Scarborough General Hospital
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 431-8101

Business Address:
Etobicoke General Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 747-3500

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 17 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FREDERICK JAMES CARMICHAEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARMICHAEL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Sep 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 1983