Caronzo, Fortunato (CPSO#: 97917)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
631 Queenston Road
Hamilton ON  L8K 6R5
Phone: (905) 560-4600
Fax: (905) 560-2644
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Caronzo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 20 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Caronzo ( CPSO# 97917 )

Business Address:
Suite 202
631 Queenston Road
Hamilton ON  L8K 6R5
Phone Number: (905) 560-4600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FORTUNATO CARONZO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARONZO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2014