Carr, Sean Adam (CPSO#: 88064)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 106
2100 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3N 2Z9
Phone: (416) 739-7558
Fax: (416) 736-4300
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Humber Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 242-1000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 04 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SEAN ADAM CARR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Feb 2008 to 02 Mar 2008
Elective Trainee - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Mar 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2011