Carroll, Julia Marie (CPSO#: 76471)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Compass Dermatology
Units 8 and 9
650 Mount Pleasant Road
Toronto ON  M4S 2N5
Phone: (647) 351-9277
Fax: (647) 351-9077
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Medcan Dermatology
Suite 1500
150 York Street
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5
Canada
Phone: (416) 350-5900
Fax: (416) 350-5980
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Julia Carroll Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Carroll ( CPSO# 76471 )

Business Address:
Compass Dermatology
Unit 8
650 Mount Pleasant Road
Toronto ON  M4S 2N5
Phone Number: (647) 351-9277

Business Address:
Medcan
150 York Street
Suite 1500
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5
Phone Number: (416) 350-5900

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 18 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIA MARIE CARROLL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARROLL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Sep 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2005 to 30 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2006 to 31 Mar 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2007