Caruso, Andrew (CPSO#: 68762)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 675-4700
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Caruso, Christie and Bourdon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 20 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Bourdon ( CPSO# 68456 )
Dr. A. Caruso ( CPSO# 68762 )
Dr. T. Christie ( CPSO# 88916 )

Business Address:
3557 Errington Avenue
Chelmsford ON  P0M 1L0

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 675-4700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Espanola General Hospital Espanola
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW CARUSO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARUSO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1997