Casale, Joseph Alfred (CPSO#: 30202)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:Queen's University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joseph A. Casale Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 19 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Casale ( CPSO# 30202 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Medical Records Location

Address: 205 - 631 Queenston Rd Hamilton ON L8K 6R5
Date Received: 22 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1978 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018