Castellani, Lucas Richard (CPSO#: 98760)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Queensland, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Rd
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone: (705) 759-3434
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lucas Castellani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 02 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Castellani ( CPSO# 98760 )

Business Address:
Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LUCAS RICHARD CASTELLANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASTELLANI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016