Causey, Shannon Elizabeth (CPSO#: 73585)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Nov 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Nov 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shannon Causey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Causey ( CPSO# 73585 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
190 Cundles Road East
Barrie ON  L4M 4S5
Phone Number: (705) 737-2347

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHANNON ELIZABETH CAUSEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAUSEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Sep 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2005