Caycedo Marulanda, Antonio Jose (CPSO#: 87208)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad El Bosque, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
41 Ramsey Lake
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Antonio Caycedo-Marulanda Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Caycedo Marulanda ( CPSO# 87208 )

Business Address:
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Business Address:
308 - 65 Larch Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 1B8
Phone Number: (705) 674-4677

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTONIO JOSE CAYCEDO MARULANDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAYCEDO MARULANDA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2007 to 19 Nov 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 20 Nov 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Colorectal Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2010