Cebrian, Clara Teresa (CPSO#: 62034)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
10th Floor
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 34334
Fax: (905) 540-6595
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Clara Cebrian Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Cebrian ( CPSO# 62034 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
50 Charlton Avenue East 10th Floor
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CLARA TERESA CEBRIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CEBRIAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Nov 1994
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1990