Cellupica, Umberto Mario (CPSO#: 69997)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 215
955 Major Mackenzie Drive
Maple ON  L6A 4P9
Phone: (905) 303-0304
Fax: (905) 303-3035
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

13175 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 0G6
Canada
Phone: (905) 954-4011
Fax: (905) 773-7090
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

37 Jacob Keffer Pky
Suite 303
Vaughan ON  L4K 5N8
Canada
Phone: (905) 553-1800
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cellupica Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 10 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. U. Cellupica ( CPSO# 69997 )

Business Address:
303 - 37 Jacob Keffer Parkway
Vaughan ON  L4K 5N8
Phone Number: (905) 553-1800

Business Address:
13175 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 0G8
Phone Number: (905) 954-4011

Business Address:
Suite 215
955 Major Mackenzie Drive
Maple ON  L6A 4P9
Phone Number: (905) 303-0304

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. UMBERTO MARIO CELLUPICA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CELLUPICA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000