Cervenko, Paul Richard (CPSO#: 58588)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 1988


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
300 Slater Street, JETN D786
Ottawa ON  K1A 1L1
Phone: 613-437-7018
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3192 Logan Farm Drive
Osgoode ON  K0A 2W0
Phone: (613) 826-2502
Fax: (613) 826-1682
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

301-1637 Woodroffe Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2G 1W2
Phone: 613-369-5060
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

775 Strand Blvd
Kingston ON  K7P 2S7
Phone: 613-546-5506
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

585 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 4K4
Phone: 613-842-0444
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

1701 Woodroffe Avenue
Nepean ON  K2G 1W2
Phone: 613-727-5755
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
USA - Washington


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. PAUL RICHARD CERVENKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CERVENKO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1988