Chacko, Mary (CPSO#: 68076)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Malayalam, Tamil

Education:Indore University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2100 Medical Centre
2100 Ellesmere Road
Suite 102
Scarborough ON  M1H 3B7
Phone: (416) 438-8517
Fax: (416) 438-8518
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chacko Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 27 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Thomas ( CPSO# 112104)
Dr. M. Chacko ( CPSO# 68076 )

Business Address:
2100 Medical Centre
102 - 2100 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1H 3B7
Phone Number: (416) 438-8517

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY CHACKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHACKO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1996