Watts, Maria del Pilar (CPSO#: 98561)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 25 Sep 2012

Summary

Former Name: Chacon, Maria del Pilar (used until: 20 Dec 2017 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Universidad Autonoma De Bucaramanga, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
HHS McMaster Children's Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75620
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Colombia

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIA DEL PILAR WATTS shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. WATTS is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. WATTS shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. WATTS is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. WATTS shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. WATTS is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. WATTS no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 25 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 04 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 05 Jun 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 04 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 05 Jun 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018