Chad, Zave Howard (CPSO#: 63025)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Aug 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Aug 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
110-2935 Conroy Rd
Ottawa ON  K1G 6C6
Phone: (613) 725-2113
Fax: (613) 725-0317
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

801 King Edward , Suite N203
Ottawa ON  K1N 6N5
Canada
Phone: 613-564-3950 Ext. 450
Fax: 613-564-6627
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J Dollin & Z Chad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 29 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Dollin ( CPSO# 62802 )
Dr. Z. Chad ( CPSO# 63025 )

Business Address:
403 - 267 O'Connor Street
Ottawa ON  K2P 1V3
Phone Number: (613) 234-2554

Business Address:
500 - 267 O'Connor Street
Ottawa ON  K2P 1V3
Phone Number: (613) 234-5588

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000

Business Address:
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000

Business Address:
100 Marie Curie Private
Ottawa ON  K1N 9N3
Phone Number: (613) 564-3650

Business Address:
2935 Conroy Road
Suite 110
Ottawa ON  K1G 6C6
Phone Number: (613) 725-2113

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Clinical Immunology Effective: 30 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatrics Effective: 14 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZAVE HOWARD CHAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1990