Chakraborty, Pranesh Kumar (CPSO#: 66599)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jan 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Newborn Screening Ontario
Children's Hospital of Eastern ON
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 3427
Fax: (613) 738-0853
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-7600
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Biochemistry Effective: 18 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PRANESH KUMAR CHAKRABORTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAKRABORTY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Biochemistry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Biochemistry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Medical Biochemistry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Medical Biochemistry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Medical Biochemistry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Medical Genetics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2001