Chakroborty, Amitabha (CPSO#: 73193)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Sep 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English, Hindi

Education:University of Calcutta, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinsky Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 389-4411
Fax: (905) 575-7320
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amitabha Chakroborty Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 23 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chakroborty ( CPSO# 73193 )

Business Address:
Henderson Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 23 Jul 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMITABHA CHAKROBORTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAKROBORTY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 24 Jul 2006 to 06 Oct 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 07 Oct 2006 to 23 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Jul 2007 to 23 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Jul 2008 to 23 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2009