Chamberlain, Debbie Mary (CPSO#: 64205)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jan 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 621-2330
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hamilton Health Sciences McMaster
& Children's Hospital
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Hamilton Health Sciences
Henderson Site
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEBBIE MARY CHAMBERLAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAMBERLAIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2003 to 31 Jul 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 14 Nov 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 1993