Chamberlain, Susan Marie (CPSO#: 63743)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Aug 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Victory 4
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-6069
Fax: (613) 548-1330
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Susan Chamberlain Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 29 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chamberlain ( CPSO# 63743 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Victory 4
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-6069

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN MARIE CHAMBERLAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAMBERLAIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1993