Chamberlain, Wayne Walter Wellington (CPSO#: 63807)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Aug 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
3045 Baseline Road
Nepean ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-2000 Ext. 2903
Fax: (613) 721-4774
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Wayne Chamberlain Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 08 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Chamberlain ( CPSO# 63807 )

Business Address:
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
3045 Baseline Road
Nepean ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WAYNE WALTER WELLINGTON CHAMBERLAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAMBERLAIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1992