Champion, Malcolm Charles (CPSO#: 31196)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Oct 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Oct 1979

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of St. Andrews, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Provos Endoscopy
2 Guardwara Rd
Ottawa K2E 1A2
Ottawa ON  K2P 1V3
Phone: (613) 216 1823 Ext. 400
Fax: (613) 225 0731
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Liver Care Canada
Suite 406
595 Montreal Rd
Ottawa ON  K4M 1B2
Canada
Phone: 613 424 4581
Fax: 613 422 2591
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Champion Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 3 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Northwest Territories

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Gastroenterology Effective: 25 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MALCOLM CHARLES CHAMPION may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAMPION is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 1979