Chan, Adrien (CPSO#: 73588)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 23 Feb 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Regional Health
Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-7200
Fax: (807) 684-5806
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adrien Chan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 05 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chan ( CPSO# 73588 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Health
Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-7204

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Atikokan General Hospital Atikokan
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Emo Site-Riverside Health Care Facilities Emo
Geraldton District Hospital Geraldton
La Verendrye Hospital,Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Manitouwadge General Hospital Manitouwadge
McCausland Hospital Terrace Bay
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital Nipigon
Notre-Dame Hospital Hearst
Rainy River Site-Riverside Health Care Facilities Rainy River
Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital Red Lake
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Wilson Memorial General Hospital Marathon

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 12 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 2001
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Feb 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 23 Feb 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 23 Feb 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from February 23, 2017, the following terms, conditions and limitations are
            imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Adrien Chan, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent  Dr. Chan has provided to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")

                                                  of

                                            DR. ADRIEN CHAN
                                             ("Dr. Chan")

                                                  to 

                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")


            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;

                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Chan, certificate of registration number 73588, am a member of the
                  College.  The College has received information regarding my conduct and
                  standard of practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Chan, acknowledge that the College initiated an investigation
                  bearing File Number 7214753 (the "Investigation") into my conduct and
                  standard of practice.

            (4)   I, Dr. Chan, acknowledge that, after the College receives an original
                  copy of this Undertaking as signed by me, no further action will be taken
                  on the Investigation.



            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   I, Dr. Chan, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (6)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Chan, undertake to practise under the guidance of a clinical
                        supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for twelve (12) months ("Clinical Supervision").  
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Chan, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s). The
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College, once every month for the first six
                              months and, thereafter, once every three months (at nine
                              months and twelve months);
                  
                        (ii)  Review at least ten (10) of my patient charts at every
                              meeting;
                  
                        (iii) Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (iv)  Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (v)   Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (vi)  Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              three months, or more frequently if the Clinical
                              Supervisor(s) has concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Chan, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be selected
                        by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the areas of concern
                        identified in the report(s) of the medical inspector dated August
                        29, 2016 and September 21, 2016, and concerns that may arise during
                        the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Chan, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under this term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" attached, and to abide by the
                        recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Chan, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Chan, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Chan, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (6)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Chan, agree that if I am required to cease practise as a
                        result of section (6)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (7)   Reports from Chief(s)of Oncology

                  (a)   I, Dr. Chan, undertake to have the Chief(s) of Oncology at Thunder
                        Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre or the Chief(s) of Oncology at
                        any other Practice Location (the "Chief(s) of Oncology) assist in
                        the monitoring of my practice. 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Chan, acknowledge that I have reviewed the undertaking of
                        the Chief of Oncology attached hereto as Appendix "B", and
                        understand what is required of the Chief(s) of Oncology, including
                        written reports to the College at year one and year two regarding
                        timeliness of my records and clinical care.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Chan, undertake to ensure that Appendix "B" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Chan, undertake that if any person who has given an
                        undertaking in the Appendix "B" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its terms, I shall, within twenty
                        (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  
                  
                  
            (8)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Chan, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after the
                        completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (6) above
                        and Appendix "A" attached, I will submit to a Reassessment of my
                        practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors selected
                        by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  I acknowledge and agree that
                        the Reassessment may include a chart review, direct observation of
                        my care, interviews with colleagues, co-workers and senior
                        administrative staff, feedback from patients and any other tools
                        deemed necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Chan, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under this term of this Undertaking and to abide by the
                        recommendations of the Assessor.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Chan, acknowledge and agree that my Clinical Supervisor(s)
                        may receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may
                        discuss with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from
                        the Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
            (9)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Chan, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
                        (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further
                        undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Chan, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Chan, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Chan, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form, attached hereto as Appendix "C". 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (10)  I, Dr. Chan, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (11)  I, Dr. Chan, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible
                  for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (12)  I, Dr. Chan, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (13)  I, Dr. Chan, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (14)  I, Dr. Chan, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (15)  I, Dr. Chan, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (16)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Chan, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Chan, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (16)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Dr. Chan was the subject of a College investigation into
                              whether he engaged in professional misconduct and/or is
                              incompetent in his oncology practice. As a result of the
                              investigation:
                  
                              *     Dr. Chan will practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                                    Supervisor acceptable to the College for twelve (12)
                                    months. 
                              *     Dr. Chan's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                                    selected by the College within six (6) months of the
                                    end of the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (17)  I, Dr. Chan, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information,
                  including all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (18)  I, Dr. Chan, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (19)  I, Dr. Chan, give my irrevocable consent to all Clinical Supervisors,
                  Chiefs of Staff, Chief(s) of Oncology and Assessors, to disclose to the
                  College, and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A";
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the provisions of the Chief of Oncology's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "B";
                  
                  (d)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (e)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  (f)   which comes to his or her attention and which he or she reasonably
                        believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: February 23, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Adrien Chan to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 23, 2017:

Dr. Chan was the subject of a College investigation into whether he engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his oncology practice. As a result of the investigation:

• Dr. Chan will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for twelve (12) months.
• Dr. Chan’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within six (6) months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.
Download Full Document (PDF)