Chan, James Wing Tai (CPSO#: 69323)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of General Internal
Medicine
Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8979
Fax: (613) 737-8688
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James W. Chan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 03 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Chan ( CPSO# 69323 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
Division of General Internal Medicine
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8979

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES WING TAI CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999