Chan, Jonathan Edison Kie-Khan (CPSO#: 79065)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 308
385 Silver Star Boulevard
Maxum Professional Centre
Scarborough ON  M1V 0E3
Phone: (647) 776-3383
Fax: (647) 776-3382
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Yee Hong Centre for Geriatric Care
Scarborough McNicoll
2311 McNicoll Avenue
Toronto ON  M1V 5L3
Canada
Phone: (416) 940-4818
Fax: (416) 321-5705
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
General Campus
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Canada
Phone: (416) 438-2911
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
Birchmount Campus
3030 BIrchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Canada
Phone: (416) 495-2400
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
Centenary Site
2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON  M1E4B9
Canada
Phone: (416) 284-8131
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jonathan E. Chan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 28 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Chan ( CPSO# 79065 )

Business Address:
Suite 308
385 Silver Star Boulevard
Scarborough ON  M1V 0E3
Phone Number: (647) 776-3383

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHAN EDISON KIE-KHAN CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008