Chan, Kenneth (CPSO#: 65379)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone: 416-431-8133
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kenneth Chan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 27 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Chan ( CPSO# 65379 )

Business Address:
Scarborough General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KENNETH CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1993