Chan, Norman George (CPSO#: 57995)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Dec 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
83 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Phone: (519) 837-9111
Fax: (519) 837-8582
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Norman G. Chan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Chan ( CPSO# 57995 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
83 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Phone Number: (519) 836-3320

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 23 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NORMAN GEORGE CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 1988