Chan, Patricia Chee Ka (CPSO#: 62932)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4190 Finch Avenue East
Suite 303
Scarborough ON  M1S 4T7
Phone: (416) 335-9889
Fax: (416) 335-9339
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Michael Garron Hospital
Nephrology/ Kidney Care Clinic
825 Coxwell Avenue
East York ON  M4C 3E7
Canada
Phone: (416) 469-6580 Ext. 3037
Fax: (416) 469-6491
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

The Scarborough & Rouge Hospital,
3050 Lawrence Ave E
Home Dialysis Clinic
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Canada
Phone: 416 431 8183
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Patricia C.K. Chan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 16 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Chan ( CPSO# 62932 )

Business Address:
303 - 4190 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 4T7
Phone Number: (416) 335-9889

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICIA CHEE KA CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994