Chan, Ruby Wai-Yan (CPSO#: 59932)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Aug 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 211
1676 Martin Drive
White Rock BC  V4A 6E7
Phone: (604) 531-7707
Fax: (604) 531-9989
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

#305
22112 52nd Avenue
Langley BC  V2Y 2M6
Canada
Phone: (604) 534-9177
Fax: (604) 534-9187
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 02 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RUBY WAI-YAN CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1989