Chan, Tommy Kwok-Chiu (CPSO#: 50382)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Apr 1983

Summary

Former Name: Chan, Tommy Kwok-Chiv (used until: 26 May 1983 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 402
1017 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3K 1Z1
Phone: (416) 636-9963
Fax: (416) 636-3015
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tommy K. C. Chan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 10 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Chan ( CPSO# 50382 )

Business Address:
402 - 1017 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3K 1Z1
Phone Number: (416) 636-9963

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 22 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TOMMY KWOK-CHIU CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 1983