Chand, Pavanjeet (CPSO#: 82077)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jan 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jan 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University India, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Amherstburg Family Health Team
721 Front Road South
Amherstburg ON  N9V 0B4
Phone: 519 736 7770
Fax: 519 736 7702
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Banwell Gardens
3000 Banwell Road
Windsor ON  N8N 0B3
Canada
Phone: 519 735 3204
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Rose land AfterHours &WalkinClinic
3480 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N9E 3N9
Canada
Phone: (519) 972-3944
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

COUNTRY VILLAGE LTCHOME
440 County Rd 8
Woodslee ON  N0R 1V0
Canada
Phone: 519 839 4812
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Village at St Clair LTC Home
1800 Talbot Rd
Windsor ON  N9H 0E3
Canada
Phone: 519 960 1050
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Moy Medical Centre
1407 Ottawa Street
Windsor ON  N8X 2G1
Canada
Phone: (519) 946 0443
Fax: (519) 946 0553
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pavan Chand Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 26 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Chand ( CPSO# 82077 )

Business Address:
440 Country Road 8
R.R. #2
Woodslee ON  N0R 1V0
Phone Number: (519) 839-4489

Business Address:
3840 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N9G 1X2
Phone Number: (519) 972-3944

Business Address:
721 Front Road South
Amherstburg ON  N9V 0B4
Phone Number: (519) 734-7770

Business Address:
1800 Talbot Road
Windsor ON  N9H 0E3
Phone Number: (519) 960-1050

Business Address:
3000 Banwell Road
Windsor ON  N8N 0B3
Phone Number: (519) 735-3204

Business Address:
Moy Medical Centre
1407 Ottawa Street
Windsor ON  N8X 2G1
Phone Number: (519) 946-0443

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAVANJEET CHAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAND is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 25 Mar 2005
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 26 Mar 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2007