Chandler, Gregory Mitchell (CPSO#: 79331)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Room 916
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 4568
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gregory M. Chandler Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 17 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Chandler ( CPSO# 79331 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Room 916, 9th Floor
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GREGORY MITCHELL CHANDLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANDLER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009