Chandra, Ranjit Kumar (CPSO#: 68606)

Current Status: Suspended as of 15 Feb 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Nov 1994

Indicates a concern or additional information


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Spanish, Urdu

Education:Punjab University India, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R.K. Chandra Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 1 2016


Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 08 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 1994
Suspension of registration imposed: Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 15 Feb 2017

Pending Hearings

Summary: Allegations of Dr. Chandra’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Chandra engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in that he failed to respond appropriately or within a reasonable time to a written inquiry from the College. It is also alleged that Dr. Chandra engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional conduct with respect to his billing practices, including by submitting false and fraudulent claims to OHIP, offering money and other inducements to patients, staff and other individuals in order to use their Health Cards, or Health Cards belonging to family members and friends, to submit false and fraudulent claims to OHIP, and by inducing staff to breach patient confidentiality.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Hearing Date(s): December 6-7, 2017; Penalty Hearing: December 14, 2017

Hearing Status: Decision Under Reserve

Practice Restrictions

Registration Status: Suspended     Effective From: 15 Feb 2017

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee Effective: 15 Feb 2017 Active