Chandrakumar, Sandrasegram (CPSO#: 68727)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 May 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 May 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Colombo, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (416) 521-4090
Fax: (416) 521-4116
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

150 sherway drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C 1A5
Canada
Phone: (416) 521-4090
Fax: (416) 521-4116
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sandrasegaram Chandrakumar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 23 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chandrakumar ( CPSO# 68727 )

Business Address:
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (416) 521-4090

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 21 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANDRASEGRAM CHANDRAKUMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANDRAKUMAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 May 1995