Chandran, Vinod (CPSO#: 82062)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Oct 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Oct 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Malayalam

Education:Calicut University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Division of Rheumatology
Room 1E 416
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5192
Fax: (416) 603-9387
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: V Chandran Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 12 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Chandran ( CPSO# 82062 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Division of Rheumatology
Room 1E 416
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5192

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Rheumatology Effective: 01 Oct 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 03 Dec 2004 to 10 Feb 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 11 Feb 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Sep 2010
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jul 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Sep 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Aug 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Sep 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 03 Aug 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Vinod Chandran may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division  of    Rheumatology,  University  of Toronto, in which Dr.
                        Chandran  holds an academic appointment at the  rank  of  Associate
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of  registration  automatically expires when Dr. Chandran
                  no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.