Chang, Benny Hong Sen (CPSO#: 65233)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 601
14 College Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1K2
Phone: (416) 966-9441
Fax: (416) 960-0489
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Benny Chang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 26 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Chang ( CPSO# 65233 )

Business Address:
Suite 601
14 College Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1K2
Phone Number: (416) 966-9441

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BENNY HONG SEN CHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1993