Chang, Boon Howe (CPSO#: 82646)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Sep 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
University Health Network
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3946
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Western Hospital
University Health Network
399 Bathurst St.
Toronto ON  M5T2S8
Canada
Phone: (416) 603-5757
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

HealthForceOntario - EDLP Program
163 Queen St. East
Toronto ON  M5A 1S1
Canada
Phone: (416) 945-3695
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Boon H. Chang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 06 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Chang ( CPSO# 82646 )

Business Address:
9 - 6400 Millcreek Drive
Mississauga ON  L5N 3E7

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
RFE - GS - 480
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 23 Oct 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BOON HOWE CHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2007