Chang, Daniel Kwan Ming (CPSO#: 63825)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 38
480 Chrysler Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C1
Phone: (905) 789-6800
Fax: (905) 789-5991
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniel Chang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Chang ( CPSO# 63825 )

Business Address:
Unit 38
480 Chrysler Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C1
Phone Number: (905) 789-6800

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL KWAN MING CHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1992