Chang, Lynn (CPSO#: 86715)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Apr 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Apr 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Division of Radiation Oncology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-7700 Ext. 25395
Fax: (613) 247-3511
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Dollin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 24 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Dollin ( CPSO# 86724 )
Dr. L. Chang ( CPSO# 86715 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
University of Ottawa Eye Institute
Box 307
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899


Corporation Name: Lynn Chang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 17 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Chang ( CPSO# 86715 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
Division of Radiation Oncology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-7700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LYNN CHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2014