Chapman, Stephen Philip (CPSO#: 93976)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Apr 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Regional
Health Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6000
Electoral District: 09
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

250 John st nort
Arnprior ON  K7S 2P6
Canada
Phone: (613) 623-3166
Fax: (613) 623-7962
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 18 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN PHILIP CHAPMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAPMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2013