Chaput, Alan Joseph (CPSO#: 76410)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Anaesthesia
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4169
Fax: (613) 761-5209
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alan J. Chaput Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 18 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chaput ( CPSO# 76410 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
Department of Anaesthesia
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000

Business Address:
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000

Business Address:
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone Number: (613) 722-6521

Business Address:
969 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  K2A 3A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALAN JOSEPH CHAPUT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAPUT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006