Charania, Naveen Nawaz (CPSO#: 87704)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Dec 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Dec 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Kachchi, Swahili, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1615 Dundas Street East,
#207
Inside Whitby Mall
Whitby ON  L1N 2L1
Phone: (289) 240-3740
Fax: (905) 240-3740
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Naveen N. Charania Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 17 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Charania ( CPSO# 87704 )

Business Address:
Whitby Urgent Care/ Walk In Clinic
1615 Dundas Street East
Suite 207
Inside Whitby Mall
Whitby ON  L1N 2L1
Phone Number: (289) 240-3740

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Dec 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAVEEN NAWAZ CHARANIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHARANIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Sep 2007 to 04 Dec 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 05 Dec 2007 to 11 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 12 Sep 2008 to 11 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 2009