Charbonneau, Danielle Louise (CPSO#: 77618)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Aug 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
169 Main Street East
Grimsby ON  L3M 1P3
Phone: (905) 945-2253 Ext. 302
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Danielle Charbonneau Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 14 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Charbonneau ( CPSO# 77618 )

Business Address:
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
169 Main Street East
Grimsby ON  L3M 1P3
Phone Number: (905) 945-2253

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 06 Oct 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIELLE LOUISE CHARBONNEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHARBONNEAU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Oct 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Queen's University, 01 Nov 2004 to 31 Oct 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2004