Charette, Yves Gerard (CPSO#: 86248)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1679 Main Street
Val Caron ON  P3N 1R8
Phone: (705) 897-1018
Fax: (705) 897-2234
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Yves G. Charette Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 30 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Charette ( CPSO# 86248 )

Business Address:
1679 Main Street
Val Caron ON  P3N 1R8
Phone Number: (705) 897-1018

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YVES GERARD CHARETTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHARETTE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009