Chase, Robert Morgan (CPSO#: 55325)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 May 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LAMP Occupational Health Program
185 Fifth Street
Etobicoke ON  M8V 2Z5
Phone: (416) 252-6471 Ext. 229
Fax: (416) 252-9141
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

MFL Occupational Health Centre
102-275 Broadway
Winnipeg MB  R3C 4M6
Canada
Phone: (204) 949-0811
Fax: (204) 956-0848
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Community Medicine Effective: 30 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT MORGAN CHASE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHASE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 May 1987