Chatha, Neel-Kamal Kaur (CPSO#: 86945)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 120
1130 Morrison Drive
Ottawa ON  K2H 9N6
Phone: (613) 820-5050
Fax: (613) 820-7831
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Canada
Phone: 613-721-2000
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chatha-Kelly Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 02 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Chatha ( CPSO# 86945 )
Dr. S. Kelly ( CPSO# 88694 )

Business Address:
Unit 120
1130 Morrison Drive
Ottawa ON  K2H 9N6
Phone Number: (613) 820-5050

Business Address:
3045 Baseline Road
Nepean ON  K2H 8P4

Business Address:
3161 Strandherd Drive
Suite 305
Ottawa ON  K1G 1A4
Phone Number: (613) 823-5245

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Great War Memorial Site-Perth Perth
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 03 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NEEL-KAMAL KAUR CHATHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHATHA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011