Chaudhry, Sukarno Nawaz (CPSO#: 85486)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Aug 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Islamia University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 155
1720 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 5A6
Phone: (519) 256-8338
Fax: (519) 258-7337
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Canada
Phone: (519) 254-5577
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Oshwa Durham Sleep Lab
292 King Street West
Oshawa ON  L1J 2J9
Canada
Phone: (905) 436-6163
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

33 Princess Street
Leamington ON  N8H 5C5
Canada
Phone: 519-325-1333
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sukarno N. Chaudhry Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 08 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chaudhry ( CPSO# 85486 )

Business Address:
Unit 155
1720 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 5A6
Phone Number: (519) 255-7968

Business Address:
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577


Corporation Name: Azam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 29 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Azam ( CPSO# 92981 )
Dr. S. Chaudhry ( CPSO# 85486 )

Business Address:
Oasis Medical Centre
486 Advance Boulevard
Suite 400
Maidstone ON  N8N 0B8
Phone Number: (519) 727-0100

Business Address:
13278 Tecumseh Manning Medical Centre
Tecumseh ON  N8N 3T6
Phone Number: (519) 979-5260

Business Address:
155 - 1720 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 5A6
Phone Number: (519) 256-8338

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUKARNO NAWAZ CHAUDHRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAUDHRY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2006