Chaudhuri, Monica Mitra (CPSO#: 72465)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Alberta, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite G1
16 O'Brien Street
Orillia ON  L3V 5S2
Phone: (705) 259-6300
Fax: (705) 481-0115
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T 1B4
Canada
Phone: (807) 737-3030
County: District of Kenora
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Monica Mitra Chaudhuri Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 09 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Chaudhuri ( CPSO# 72465 )

Business Address:
Suite 202
16 O'Brien Street
Orillia ON  L3V 5S2
Phone Number: (705) 325-4936

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
La Verendrye Hospital,Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MONICA MITRA CHAUDHURI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAUDHURI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003