Chaudry, Bushra (CPSO#: 86935)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rideau Valley Health Centre
1221 Greenbank Road
Ottawa ON  K2J 5V7
Phone: (613) 258-8710
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. Chaudry Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 10 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Chaudry ( CPSO# 86935 )

Business Address:
Rideau Valley Health Centre
1221 Greenbank Road
Ottawa ON  K2J 5V7

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 19 Oct 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BUSHRA CHAUDRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAUDRY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2009